Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0551276
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
23.10.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] |
14.08.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] |
10.07.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.1998 [1998/35] |
31.10.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] |
19.09.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.06.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.06.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.02.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
14.11.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.08.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.07.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.05.1995 |
First examination report |
|
03.06.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] |
03.06.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] |