Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9301371 | Global Dossier | 21.01.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9101270 | 08.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU652165B | Global Dossier | 18.08.1994 | B2 | AU8100591 | 11.02.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9101270 | 08.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0551276 | Global Dossier | 17.12.1997 | B1 | EP0551276 | 21.07.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9101270 | 08.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2090868 | 18.09.2001 | C | CA2090868 | 09.01.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9101270 | 08.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69128482T | 09.04.1998 | T2 | DE69128482D1 | 29.01.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9101270 | 08.07.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5333429 | 02.08.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9101270 | 08.07.1991 |