EP0558746 - ROTOR OF BRUSHLESS MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 04.11.1998 [1998/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGATE, Takashi, Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392 / JP | 02 /
ENDO, Kenichi, Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392 / JP | 03 /
KOIKE, Yoshikazu, Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392 / JP | 04 /
SETO, Takeshi, Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392 / JP | 05 /
YAMAGISHI, Yoshihiko, Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5,Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392 / JP | [1993/36] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91912495.8 | 10.07.1991 | [1993/36] | WO1991JP00927 | Priority number, date | JP19900314626 | 20.11.1990 Original published format: JP 31462690 | JP19900314627 | 20.11.1990 Original published format: JP 31462790 | [1993/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9209131 | Date: | 29.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558746 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0558746 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.05.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/27 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
H02K1/2746 (EP,US);
H02K1/27 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1993/36] | Title | German: | LÄUFER EINES BÜRSTENLOSEN MOTORS | [1993/36] | English: | ROTOR OF BRUSHLESS MOTOR | [1993/36] | French: | ROTOR DE MOTEUR SANS BALAIS | [1993/36] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.1993 | Translation filed | 18.05.1993 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.1993 | Search fee paid | 18.05.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 04.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 10.07.1997 | CH | 31.07.1997 | LI | 31.07.1997 | [1998/45] |
Former [1998/30] | GB | 10.07.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4631435 (MCCARTY FREDERICK B [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 5, line 1 - line 20; figures 2,3 * * claim 10 *; | [A]US3445700 (PRANGE RAYMON A, et al) [A] 2,3 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 73; figure 4 * | International search | [Y]JPS4933482B ; | [Y]JPS4921525Y ; | [Y]JPH01209942 (SHIN MEIWA IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPS5734170U |