EP0537249 - SILENCER FOR DISC AND DRUM BRAKES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFRED TEVES GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 Postfach 90 01 20 60441 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states ALFRED TEVES GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 Postfach 90 01 20 D-60441 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WÖRSDÖRFER, Karl-Fr. Schillerstrasse 32 D-6501 Budenheim / DE | 02 /
EGERER, Thomas Feldstrasse 2 D-6367 Karben 3 / DE | 03 /
WORMS, Reinhold Lehmbreite 34 D-3470 Höxter/Westf. / DE | 04 /
DREILICH, Ludwig Altkönigstrasse 1 D-6232 Bad Soden 3 / DE | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Portwich, Peter c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | Portwich, Peter c/o ITT Automotive Europe GmbH Guerickestrasse 7 D-60488 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 91912584.9 | 03.07.1991 | [1993/16] | WO1991EP01242 | Priority number, date | DE19904021567 | 06.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4021567 | DE19904036401 | 15.11.1990 Original published format: DE 4036401 | [1993/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9201169 | Date: | 23.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537249 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/00, F16D55/00, G10K11/16 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
G10K11/16 (EP);
F16D55/00 (EP);
F16D65/00 (EP);
F16D65/0006 (EP);
F16D65/0018 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1993/16] | Title | German: | GERÄUSCHDÄMPFER FÜR SCHEIBEN- ODER TROMMELBREMSE | [1993/16] | English: | SILENCER FOR DISC AND DRUM BRAKES | [1993/16] | French: | AMORTISSEUR DE BRUIT POUR FREINS A DISQUE OU A TAMBOUR | [1993/16] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 31.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/30] | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP5817234 ; | [A]US1833413 ; | [A]US3598417 ; | [A]GB2206935 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 95 (M-209)(1240) 21. April 1983 & JP-A-58 17 234 (SUMITOMO DENKI KOGYO K.K. ) 1. Februar 1983 siehe das ganze Dokument, & JP5817234 A 00000000 |