EP0543828 - TEMPERATURE SENSOR AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING TEMPERATURE-SENSOR ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/22] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIESE, Karl-Hermann Strohgäustrasse 13 D-7250 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
NEUMANN, Harald Lehmenstrasse 29/1 D-7143 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [1997/16] |
Former [1993/22] | 01 /
FRIESE, Karl-Hermann Strohgäustrasse 13 D-7250 Leonberg / DE | ||
02 /
NEUMANN, Harald Lehmenstrasse 29/1 D-7143 Vaihingen/Enzweihingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91912927.0 | 25.07.1991 | [1993/22] | WO1991DE00601 | Priority number, date | DE19904025715 | 14.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4025715 | [1993/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9203711 | Date: | 05.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0543828 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0543828 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01K7/18 | [1993/22] | CPC: |
G01K7/18 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T29/49085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/22] | Title | German: | TEMPERATURFÜHLER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TEMPERATURFÜHLERELEMENTEN | [1993/22] | English: | TEMPERATURE SENSOR AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING TEMPERATURE-SENSOR ELEMENTS | [1993/22] | French: | CAPTEUR DE TEMPERATURE ET PROCEDE POUR LA FABRICATION D'ELEMENTS DE CAPTEURS DE TEMPERATURE | [1993/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 28.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/22] | 06.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3829764 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]); | [A]WO8903033 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |