EP0495987 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING SYNCHRONIZED PHASES IN SYSTEM FOR DRIVING PRINTING ROLLS FOR CORRUGATED BOARD PRINTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 2-1, Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi Fukuoka 806 / JP | For all designated states HAMADA PRINTING PRESS CO., LTD. 2-15-28, Mitejima Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI SEISAKUSHO 2-1, Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806 / JP | ||
For all designated states HAMADA PRINTING PRESS CO., LTD. 2-15-28, Mitejima Nishiyodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEGUCHI, Masao, Yukuhashi Plant, K.K.Yaskawa Denki Seisakusho, 13-1, Nishimiyaichi 2-chome Yukuhashi-shi, Fukuoka 824kuoka 824 / JP | [1992/31] | Representative(s) | Holdcroft, James Gerald, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | Holdcroft, James Gerald, Dr., et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91913077.3 | 19.07.1991 | [1992/31] | WO1991JP00963 | Priority number, date | JP19900190680 | 20.07.1990 Original published format: JP 19068090 | [1992/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9201562 | Date: | 06.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495987 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495987 | Date: | 18.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.02.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/14 | [1995/42] | CPC: |
B41F13/0045 (EP,US);
B41F13/14 (EP,US);
B41P2213/734 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/31] | B41F33/08, H02P5/00, G05D13/62 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Regeln der Phase in einem Druckrollenantriebsystem für Wellpappendruckmaschinen | [1992/31] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING SYNCHRONIZED PHASES IN SYSTEM FOR DRIVING PRINTING ROLLS FOR CORRUGATED BOARD PRINTING MACHINE | [1992/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE REGULATION DE PHASES SYNCHRONISEES DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE ROULEAUX IMPRIMEURS POUR MACHINE D'IMPRESSION SUR CARTON ONDULE | [1992/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.1992 | Translation filed | 03.04.1992 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.1992 | Search fee paid | 03.04.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 17.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0234676 (MOLINS MACHINE CO INC [US]); | [A]WO8000231 (DERITEND ENG CO [GB], et al); | [A]EP0096563 (HARRIS GRAPHICS CORP [US]) | International search | JPS60250955 [ ] (HAMADA PRINTING PRESS); | JPS5571188 [ ] (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) |