EP0538362 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FREE-FORM SOLID-PHASE OBJECT FROM A MATERIAL IN THE LIQUID PHASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INCRE, Inc. 1233 NW Lewisburg Road Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US | [1994/48] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states GORE, David W. 1233 NW Lewisburg Avenue Corvallis, OR 97330 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gore, David W. 1233 NW Lewisburg Road Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US | [1997/18] |
Former [1993/17] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | Lawrence, Malcolm Graham Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Bakers Lane Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91913199.5 | 09.07.1991 | [1993/17] | WO1991US04860 | Priority number, date | US19900550875 | 11.07.1990 Original published format: US 550875 | [1993/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200820 | Date: | 23.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0538362 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0538362 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.01.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B22D23/00 | [1993/17] | CPC: |
B29C41/36 (EP);
B22D23/00 (EP);
B29C64/112 (EP);
G05B2219/49015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/17] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN GESTALTFREIER FESTER OBJEKTE AUS DER FLÜSSIGEN PHASE | [1993/17] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FREE-FORM SOLID-PHASE OBJECT FROM A MATERIAL IN THE LIQUID PHASE | [1993/17] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN OBJET A PHASE SOLIDE DE FORME LIBRE A PARTIR D'UNE MATIERE EN PHASE LIQUIDE | [1993/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.1993 | Search fee paid | 18.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 18.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 19.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.1997 | BE | 02.05.1997 | CH | 02.05.1997 | DK | 02.05.1997 | ES | 02.05.1997 | GR | 02.05.1997 | LI | 02.05.1997 | NL | 02.05.1997 | LU | 09.07.1997 | SE | 02.08.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 02.05.1997 | |
BE | 02.05.1997 | ||
CH | 02.05.1997 | ||
DK | 02.05.1997 | ||
ES | 02.05.1997 | ||
GR | 02.05.1997 | ||
LI | 02.05.1997 | ||
NL | 02.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.07.1997 | ||
SE | 02.08.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 02.05.1997 | |
BE | 02.05.1997 | ||
CH | 02.05.1997 | ||
DK | 02.05.1997 | ||
ES | 02.05.1997 | ||
GR | 02.05.1997 | ||
LI | 02.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.07.1997 | ||
SE | 02.08.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 02.05.1997 | |
BE | 02.05.1997 | ||
CH | 02.05.1997 | ||
DK | 02.05.1997 | ||
GR | 02.05.1997 | ||
LI | 02.05.1997 | ||
LU | 31.07.1997 | ||
SE | 02.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.05.1997 | |
BE | 02.05.1997 | ||
CH | 02.05.1997 | ||
DK | 02.05.1997 | ||
LI | 02.05.1997 | ||
SE | 02.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 02.05.1997 | |
BE | 02.05.1997 | ||
CH | 02.05.1997 | ||
LI | 02.05.1997 | ||
SE | 02.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 02.05.1997 | |
BE | 02.05.1997 | ||
CH | 02.05.1997 | ||
LI | 02.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 02.05.1997 | |
CH | 02.05.1997 | ||
LI | 02.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 02.05.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US3222776 (KAWECKI RICHARD J); | [A]US4665492 (MASTERS WILLIAM E [US]); | [A]US4911353 (DEAKIN DAVID [US]); | [AE]US5038014 (PRATT VANON D [US], et al) |