EP0539462 - A METHOD FOR PREPARING 4-CHLORO-2-METHYLPHENOXYALKANOIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KVK AGRO A/S Gl. Lyngvej 2 DK-4600 Koge / DK | [1993/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OXB L, Arne Borgmester Godskesens Plads 9 DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | 02 /
HOLM-JENSEN, Bjarne Lundeg rdshegnet 104 Tune DK-4000 Roskilde / DK | [1993/18] | Representative(s) | Andersen, Henrik Rastrup, et al Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1993/18] | Andersen, Henrik Rastrup, et al c/o Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S, Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 DK-1021 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 91913384.3 | 16.07.1991 | [1993/18] | WO1991DK00208 | Priority number, date | DK19900001707 | 16.07.1990 Original published format: DK 170790 | [1993/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9201663 | Date: | 06.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0539462 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C59/70, C07C59/68, C07C51/363, C07B39/00 | [1993/18] | CPC: |
C07C51/363 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/363, C07C59/68 (EP);
C07C51/363, C07C59/70 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, GB, NL [1993/18] | Title | German: | Eine Methode zur Herstellung von 4-Chloro-2-Methylphenoxy-Alkansäuren | [1993/18] | English: | A METHOD FOR PREPARING 4-CHLORO-2-METHYLPHENOXYALKANOIC ACIDS | [1993/18] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ACIDES 4-CHLORO-2-METHYLPHENOXYALCANOIQUES | [1993/18] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 16.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/13] | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR1470160 ; | [Y]DE1014092 ; | [Y]GB744475 ; | [A]US3764617 ; | [A]US3751461 |