EP0487719 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 9-BETA-D-ARABINOFURANOSYL-2-FLUOROADENINE 5'-PHOSPHATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.08.1999 [1999/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASH STEVENS, INC. 5861 John C. Lodge Freeway Detroit Michigan 48202-3398 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states ASH STEVENS, INC. 5861 John C. Lodge Freeway Detroit, Michigan 48202-3398 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLUMBERGS, Peter 4105 Springer Royal Oak, MI 48072 / US | 02 /
KHAN, Mohammed, S. Sayyada Mansion, 6-Arazi Bagh Azamgarh City, U.P.-276001 / IN | 03 /
KALAMAS, Richard, L. 18151 Wilson Court Wyandotte, MI 48192 / US | 04 /
PATEL, Ambalal 1155 Player Drive Troy, MI 48089 / US | 05 /
LAMONTAGNE, Maurice, P. 29126 Hemlock Drive Farmington Hills, MI 48018 / US | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91913406.4 | 26.06.1991 | [1992/23] | WO1991US04566 | Priority number, date | US19900544746 | 27.06.1990 Original published format: US 544746 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200312 | Date: | 09.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487719 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0487719 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.01.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/00 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
C07H19/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 9-BETA-D-ARABINOFURANOSYL-2-FLUOROADENIN 5'-PHOSPHATEN | [1992/23] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF 9-BETA-D-ARABINOFURANOSYL-2-FLUOROADENINE 5'-PHOSPHATE | [1992/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE 9-BETA-ARABINOFURANOSYL-2-FLUOROADENINE 5'-PHOSPHATE | [1998/33] |
Former [1992/23] | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE 9-$g(b)-ARABINOFURANOSYL-2-FLUOROADENINE 5'-PHOSPHATE | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.1992 | Search fee paid | 26.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/23] | 22.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3413282 (MASAHARU YOSHIKAWA, et al); | [Y]US4093714 (TOLMAN RICHARD L, et al); | [X]US4123609 (BEHNKE WALTER E, et al); | [A]US4136175 (RIDEOUT JANET E, et al); | [Y]US4357324 (MONTGOMERY JOHN A, et al) |