EP0549590 - SELF EXPANDING VASCULAR ENDOPROSTHESIS FOR ANEURYSMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.1996 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANE, Rodney James Greenwich Square, 130-134 Pacific Highway St.Leonards, NSW 2065 / AU | [1993/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/27] | Representative(s) | DELETED Tribe, Thomas Geoffrey (GB) R. 102(1) 28.01.2003, et al fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane GB-London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | Tribe, Thomas Geoffrey (GB), et al F.J. Cleveland & Company 40-43 Chancery Lane GB-London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91913559.0 | 23.07.1991 | [1993/27] | WO1991AU00326 | Priority number, date | AU19900001374 | 26.07.1990 Original published format: AU 137490 | [1993/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9201425 | Date: | 06.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0549590 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.02.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [1994/15] | CPC: |
A61F2/92 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/27] | A61F2/06, A61M29/00, A61M25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/27] | Title | German: | SELBSTEXPANDIERENDE, VASKULARE ENDOPROTHESE FÜR ANEURYSMA | [1993/27] | English: | SELF EXPANDING VASCULAR ENDOPROSTHESIS FOR ANEURYSMS | [1993/27] | French: | ENDOPROTHESE VASCULAIRE A AUTODILATATION POUR ANEVRISMES | [1993/27] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.1993 | Search fee paid | 25.02.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 01.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/30] | 28.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2617721 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0326426 (NIPPON MEDICAL SUPPLY [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 37 - line 42; figure 4 *; | [PA]EP0380668 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [PA] 1,5,6* abstract * | International search | [XY]JPS5789859 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]US4740207 (KREAMER JEFFRY W [US]); | [XY]AU1490488 (TERUMO CORP); | [XY]JPS6486983 (NIPPON ZEON CO); | [Y]US4820298 (LEVEEN ERIC G [US], et al); | [Y]US4830003 (WOLFF RODNEY G [US], et al); | [Y]US4923464 (DIPISA JR JOSEPH A [US]); | [PX]JPH02255157 (NIPPON ZEON CO) |