EP0537281 - DEVICE FOR WITHDRAWING FILLING MATERIAL FROM BAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/16] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEUCKE, Karl-Heinrich Rubensweg 13 D-2000 Norderstedt / DE | 02 /
SCHMITZ, Guenter Feldstrasse 49 D-2000 Hamburg 36 / DE | [1993/16] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/16] | Baillie, Iain Cameron c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91913568.1 | 03.06.1991 | [1993/16] | WO1991US03911 | Priority number, date | DE19904021743 | 07.07.1990 Original published format: DE 4021743 | [1993/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9200895 | Date: | 23.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0537281 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.01.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0537281 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58, B67B7/86 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
B65D75/5877 (EP);
B67B7/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/16] | Title | German: | FÜLLSTUTZEN FÜR EINEN SACK | [1993/16] | English: | DEVICE FOR WITHDRAWING FILLING MATERIAL FROM BAGS | [1993/16] | French: | SYSTEME SERVANT A RETIRER UNE MATIERE D'UNE POCHE | [1993/16] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 02.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 23.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8101992 ; | [A]AU491840B ; | [A]GB1104359 |