EP0496852 - NOVEL ADENOSINE DERIVATIVES, THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANDOZ LTD. Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states SANDOZ LTD. Lichtstrasse 35 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GADIENT, Fulvio Baslerstrasse 45 CH-4127 Birsfelden / CH | [1992/32] | Application number, filing date | 91913964.2 | 13.08.1991 | [1992/32] | WO1991CH00170 | Priority number, date | DE19904025879 | 16.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4025879 | [1992/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9203463 | Date: | 05.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0496852 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/16, A61K31/70 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
C07H19/16 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/32] | Title | German: | NEUE ADENOSIN-DERIVATE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [1992/32] | English: | NOVEL ADENOSINE DERIVATIVES, THEIR PRODUCTION AND USE | [1992/32] | French: | NOUVEAUX DERIVES DE L'ADENOSINE, PREPARATION ET UTILISATION | [1992/32] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.1992 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 01.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/34] | 30.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4167565 (STEIN HERMAN H, et al); | [A]US4514405 (IRMSCHER KLAUS [DE], et al); | [A]EP0152944 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0179667 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) | [X] - Carbohydrate Research, Band 109, 1982, Elsevier Scientific Publishing Company, (Amsterdam, NL), Ichiro Hirao et al.:" Bis(tributylin) oxide-phenyl isocyanate system for regioselective(phenylcarbamoyl)ation of purine and pyrimidine ribonucleosides", Seiten 181-205, siehe Seite 182, Verbindung 2 |