EP0498891 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING SERVOMOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWASHITA, Yasusuke, Fanuc Dai-3 Vira-karamatsu 3527-1, Shibokusa, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [1992/34] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91914193.7 | 08.08.1991 | [1992/34] | WO1991JP01065 | Priority number, date | JP19900232848 | 03.09.1990 Original published format: JP 23284890 | [1992/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9204668 | Date: | 19.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0498891 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.03.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G05D13/62, G05D3/12, H02P5/00, G05B13/04 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
G05B13/04 (EP);
G05B19/19 (EP);
H02P23/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [1992/34] | Title | German: | REGELUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN SERVOMOTOR | [1992/34] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING SERVOMOTOR | [1992/34] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE POUR SERVOMOTEUR | [1992/34] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.1992 | Translation filed | 22.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.1992 | Search fee paid | 22.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 20.12.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3722099 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0329796 (FANUC LTD [JP]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS IECON'85 10 November 1985, HYATT REGENCY HOTEL,SAN FRANCISCO,US pages 755 - 760 K.SAITO ET AL.. 'A microprocessor-controlled speed regulator with instantanous speed estimatio for motor drives' | International search | JPH02136906 [ ] (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | JPH0210411 [ ] (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP); | JPH0380311 [ ] (MITUTOYO CORP) |