EP0495996 - POLYETHYLENE RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | For all designated states SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Masami, Showa Denko K.K. Kawasaki Plastics Lab., 3-2, Chidoricho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | 02 /
AOYAGI, Hikaru, Showa Denko K. K. Kawasaki Plastics Laboratory, 3-2, Chidoricho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | [1992/31] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91914194.5 | 08.08.1991 | [1992/31] | WO1991JP01062 | Priority number, date | JP19900212416 | 10.08.1990 Original published format: JP 21241690 | [1992/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9202581 | Date: | 20.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495996 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495996 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.02.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/04, C08L23/26, C08L51/06, // B32B27/32 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
C08L23/0815 (EP);
C08L23/06 (EP);
C08L51/06 (EP);
C08L2205/02 (EP);
C08L2205/03 (EP);
C08L2205/035 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L51/06, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C08L51/06, C08L2666/04 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/31] | Title | German: | POLYETHYLENHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1992/31] | English: | POLYETHYLENE RESIN COMPOSITION | [1992/31] | French: | COMPOSITION A BASE DE RESINE POLYETHYLENE | [1992/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.1992 | Translation filed | 07.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.1992 | Search fee paid | 07.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 25.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.11.1996 | BE | 13.11.1996 | CH | 13.11.1996 | DK | 13.11.1996 | ES | 13.11.1996 | GR | 13.11.1996 | LI | 13.11.1996 | NL | 13.11.1996 | SE | 13.02.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
CH | 13.11.1996 | ||
DK | 13.11.1996 | ||
ES | 13.11.1996 | ||
GR | 13.11.1996 | ||
LI | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
CH | 13.11.1996 | ||
DK | 13.11.1996 | ||
GR | 13.11.1996 | ||
LI | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
CH | 13.11.1996 | ||
DK | 13.11.1996 | ||
LI | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
CH | 13.11.1996 | ||
LI | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 13.11.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4087587 (SHIDA MITSUZO, et al); | [A]GB2119389 (ACC CHEM CO, et al); | [A]EP0171777 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) | International search | JPS60130636 [ ] (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO); | JPS6114242 [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND); | JPS628461B [ ]; | JPS62119248 [ ] (TOA NENRYO KOGYO KK) | Examination | JPH00628461B | JPH06114242 |