EP0540650 - GAMMA-CARBOXYLASE AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZymoGenetics, Inc. 4225 Roosevelt Way, N.E. Seattle, WA 98105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | For all designated states ZYMOGENETICS, INC. 4225 Roosevelt Way, N.E. Seattle, WA 98105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERKNER, Kathleen, L. 3032 22nd Avenue West Seattle, WA 98199 / US | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Brown, John D., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91914387.5 | 22.07.1991 | [1993/19] | WO1991US05177 | Priority number, date | US19900557220 | 23.07.1990 Original published format: US 557220 | US19910669735 | 14.03.1991 Original published format: US 669735 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9201795 | Date: | 06.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540650 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/60, C12N9/88, C12N5/10, C12N15/12, // C12N15/57, C12N15/10 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
C12N9/647 (EP);
C12N9/88 (EP);
F02B2075/027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/19] | Title | German: | GAMMA-CARBOXYLASE UND METHODEN DER ANWENDUNG | [1993/19] | English: | GAMMA-CARBOXYLASE AND METHODS OF USE | [1993/19] | French: | GAMMA-CARBOXYLASE ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [1993/19] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/20] | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YP]WO9101372 ; | [Y]WO8704719 | [Y] - Chemical Abstracts, volume 112, no. 9, 26 February 1990, (Columbus, Ohio, US), M.C. Harbeck et al.: "Vitamin K-dependent carboxylase: partial purification of the enzyme by antibody affinity techniques", see page 366, abstract 72673a, & Thromb. Res. 1989, 56(2), 317-23 | [Y] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., volume 86, September 1989, Biochemistry, B. Hubbard et al.: "Vitamin K-dependent carboxylase: affinity purification from bovine liver by using a synthetic propeptide containing the gamma-carboxylation recognition site", pages 6893-6897, see the whole article (cited in the application) | [Y] - Biological Abstracts, volume 75, no. 11, 1983, (US), J.M. Girardot: "Vitamin K-dependent carboxylase: Partial purification and properties of the enzyme-substrate complex", see page 8327, abstract 79838, & J. Biol. Chem. 257 (24), 15008-15009,1982 (cited in the application) | [L] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., USA, volume 88, 15 March 1991, Biochemistry, (Washington, DC, US), S.M. Wu et al.: "Identification and purification to near homogeneity of the vitamin K-dependent carboxylase", pages 2236-2240, see page 2239, left-hand column, line 28 - right-hand column, line 31 (cited as a L-document to indicate the incertitude of the exactness of the vitamin K-dependent carboxylase described in PNAS, vol. 86, p.6893 and WO 91/1372) | [A] - The Journal of Biological Chemistry, volume 262, no. 14, 15 May 1987, Am. Soc. Biol. Chem., Inc., (US), M.J. Jorgensen et al.: "Expression of completely gamma-carboxylated recombinant human prothrombin", pages 6729-6734, see page 6732, left-hand column, line 29 - page 6733, right-hand column, line 40 |