EP0495961 - CARDBOARD PACKAGING FOR LIQUIDS AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL EDELMANN GMBH Paradiesstrasse 20 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company Coca-Cola-Plaza Atlanta Georgia 30301 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | For all designated states Carl Edelmann GmbH Paradiesstrasse 20 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
For all designated states THE COCA-COLA COMPANY Coca-Cola-Plaza Atlanta, Georgia 30301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEUBERGER, Erich Taxisstrasse 22 D-89561 Trugenhofen / DE | 02 /
KNÖRRICH, Wolf-Dieter Ludwig-Richter-Strasse 66 D-89520 Heidenheim / DE | 03 /
DZIALLAS, Joachim W. Lichtensteinstrasse 2 D-89518 Heidenheim / DE | 04 /
PLESTER, George Rheinstrasse 79 D-45219 Essen / DE | 05 /
TROSKA, Georg Erlenstrasse 23 D-45701 Herten / DE | [1995/18] |
Former [1992/31] | 01 /
HEUBERGER, Erich Taxisstrasse 22 D-7925 Trugenhofen / DE | ||
02 /
KNÖRRICH, Wolf-Dieter Ludwig-Richter-Strasse 66 D-7920 Heidenheim / DE | |||
03 /
DZIALLAS, Joachim, W. Liechtensteinstrasse 2 D-7920 Heidenheim / DE | |||
04 /
PLESTER, George Rheinstrasse 79 D-4300 Essen 18 / DE | |||
05 /
TROSKA, Georg Erlenstrasse 23 D-4352 Herten / DE | Representative(s) | Körner, Ekkehard Patentanwalt Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | Körner, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91914862.7 | 16.08.1991 | [1992/31] | WO1991EP01563 | Priority number, date | DE19904026562 | 22.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4026562 | [1992/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9203352 | Date: | 05.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495961 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0495961 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/06 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
B65D77/065 (EP,US);
B65D77/062 (EP,US);
Y10S493/907 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/31] | Title | German: | KARTONVERPACKUNG FÜR FLÜSSIGKEITEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | [1992/31] | English: | CARDBOARD PACKAGING FOR LIQUIDS AND METHOD FOR MAKING THE SAME | [1992/31] | French: | EMBALLAGE EN CARTON POUR LIQUIDES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1992/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1992 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/31] | 24.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 03.05.1995 | GR | 03.05.1995 | LI | 03.05.1995 | AT | 16.08.1995 | DK | 16.08.1995 | ES | 17.08.1995 | SE | 17.08.1995 | BE | 31.08.1995 | LU | 31.08.1995 | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/05] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
GR | 03.05.1995 | ||
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
AT | 16.08.1995 | ||
DK | 16.08.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
BE | 31.08.1995 | ||
LU | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1997/03] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
AT | 16.08.1995 | ||
DK | 16.08.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
BE | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/46] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
DK | 16.08.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
BE | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/31] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
BE | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/23] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | ||
SE | 17.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | CH | 03.05.1995 | |
LI | 03.05.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]AU34300 ; | [A]CH359094 (MENSING HANSJUERGEN [DE], et al); | [A]US3539360 (WOOD ROBERT N); | [A]GB2117736 (TOKAN KOGYO CO LTD); | [A]DE8532685U ; | [A]EP0273102 (EDELMANN CARL VERPACKUNG [DE]); | [A]DE3802793 (HOLFELDER WERKE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | Examination | AU3430071 |