Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0537294
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.12.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
03.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
15.08.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] |
08.08.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] |
30.05.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] |
23.05.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] |
23.08.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.10.1996 [1996/41] |
06.08.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.07.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.05.1996 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.06.1996 [1996/26] |
10.05.1996 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.06.1996 [1996/26] |
17.04.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.06.1993 |
First examination report |
|
05.03.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] |
05.03.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] |