Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU655198B | Global Dossier | 08.12.1994 | B2 | AU8432091 | 04.02.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US9104707 | 02.07.1991 | US54798890 | 03.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0537294 | Global Dossier | 09.10.1996 | B1 | EP0537294 | 21.04.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9104707 | 02.07.1991 | US54798890 | 03.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2086607 | 31.10.2000 | C | CA2086607 | 04.01.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9104707 | 02.07.1991 | US54798890 | 03.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ399592 | 12.05.1993 | A3 | Priority number | Date | US9104707 | 02.07.1991 | US54798890 | 03.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69122617D1 | 14.11.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9104707 | 02.07.1991 | US54798890 | 03.07.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5169414 | 08.12.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US54798890 | 03.07.1990 | US71145591 | 06.06.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9200793 | Global Dossier | 23.01.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US54798890 | 03.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3109828B | Global Dossier | 20.11.2000 | B2 | JPH06500497 | 20.01.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US54798890 | 03.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU680712B | Global Dossier | 07.08.1997 | B2 | AU1369995 | 25.05.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US54798890 | 03.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE143826T | 15.10.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US54798890 | 03.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5057128 | 15.10.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US54798890 | 03.07.1990 |