EP0544744 - OZONIZED WATER GENERATOR FOR STERILIZATION AND OZONOTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAITRA, S.A. Av. Conde Terrefiel, 36 Bajo E-46870 Onteniente / ES | [1993/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LLORET GIMENEZ, Encarnacion Av. Conde Terrefiel, 36 Bajo E-46870 Onteniente / ES | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | de Arpe Fernandez, Manuel Arpe Patentes y Marcas Edificio Aqua, Calle Agustín de Foxá 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | De Arpe Fernandez, Manuel ARPE Patentes y Marcas Guzmán El Bueno, 133 E-28003 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 91915002.9 | 26.06.1991 | [1993/23] | WO1991ES00038 | Priority number, date | ES19910001503 | 25.06.1991 Original published format: ES 9101503 | [1993/23] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9300291 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544744 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C01B13/10, C01B13/11, C02F1/78 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
C01B13/11 (EP);
C01B13/10 (EP);
C02F1/78 (EP);
C01B2201/14 (EP);
C01B2201/32 (EP);
C02F2201/782 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/23] | Title | German: | Wasserstoffperoxiderzeuger für Sterilisation und Ozontherapie | [1993/23] | English: | OZONIZED WATER GENERATOR FOR STERILIZATION AND OZONOTHERAPY | [1993/23] | French: | GENERATEUR D'EAU OZONISEE POUR STERILISATION ET OZONOTHERAPIE | [1993/23] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.1992 | Translation filed | 29.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 04.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/21] | 19.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.08.1993 | M01   Fee paid on   17.09.1993 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.09.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]ES2014362 ; | [X]ES2003131 ; | [A]EP0253305 ; | [A]DE3731168 ; | [A]US3967131 ; | [A]US4035657 ; | [A]WO8001906 |