EP0540672 - AIR TRANSFER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US | [1993/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGEL, Donald Francis 16831 Whitewood Avenue Prior Lake, MN 55372 / US | 02 /
GIESEKE, Steven Scott 6329 Third Avenue South Richfield, MN 55431 / US | [1993/19] | Representative(s) | Petri, Stellan, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/19] | Petri, Stellan, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 41 88 S-203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 91915193.6 | 07.06.1991 | [1993/19] | WO1991US04016 | Priority number, date | US19900557982 | 26.07.1990 Original published format: US 557982 | [1993/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9201886 | Date: | 06.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0540672 | Date: | 12.05.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0540672 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/03, F16L27/10 | [1993/19] | CPC: |
F02M35/10144 (EP,US);
F02M35/164 (EP,US);
F16L21/03 (EP,US);
F16L21/06 (EP,US);
F16L37/084 (EP,US);
F02M35/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/19] | Title | German: | LUFTFÜHRUNGSSYSTEM | [1993/19] | English: | AIR TRANSFER SYSTEM | [1993/19] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRANSFERT D'AIR | [1993/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 13.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1985325 (NATHAN TRACY D); | [A]US3325174 (WEAVER SIMEON D); | [A]FR2078457 (MASSEY FERGUSON SERVICES NV); | [A]US4127290 (MUTSCHLECHNER HERMANN); | [A]US4856826 (ENGEL DONALD F [US], et al) |