EP0543908 - FLOW CONTROL METHOD AND MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/22] | For all designated states ROLLS-ROYCE plc 65 Buckingham Gate London, SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREEMAN, Christopher Lyndhurst, New Hill Farnsfield, Nottinghamshire NG22 8JN / GB | 02 /
DAY, Ivor, John 1 Beldame Close Toft, Cambridge CB3 7RN / GB | [1993/22] | Representative(s) | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls-Royce plc Patents Department P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [2009/40] |
Former [1995/46] | Gunn, Michael Alan Rolls Royce plc P.O. Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [1993/35] | Dargavel, Laurence Peter Rolls-Royce plc Patents Department P.O. Box 31 Moor Lane Derby DE2 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [1993/22] | Gura, Henry Alan MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91915299.1 | 19.08.1991 | [1993/22] | WO1991GB01407 | Priority number, date | GB19900018188 | 18.08.1990 Original published format: GB 9018188 | [1993/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9203661 | Date: | 05.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0543908 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0543908 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F04D27/02 | [1993/22] | CPC: |
F04D27/0215 (EP);
F04D27/001 (EP);
F04D27/0238 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MITTEL ZUR STRÖMUNGSKONTROLLE | [1993/22] | English: | FLOW CONTROL METHOD AND MEANS | [1993/22] | French: | PROCEDE ET MOYENS DE REGULATION D'ECOULEMENT | [1993/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 16.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/22] | 14.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2248427 ; | [A]US4196472 ; | [A]GB2191606 ; | [A]FR1136881 | [A] - Journal of Propulsion and Power, volume 5, no. 2, 1989, A.H. Epstein et al.: "Active suppression of aerodynamic instabilities in turbomachines", pages 204-211, see the whole article (cited in the application) |