EP0550464 - ANTIVIRAL COMPOUNDS AND ANTIHYPERTENSIVE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.01.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Corporation 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, NJ 07033 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states SCHERING CORPORATION 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth New Jersey 07033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AFONSO, Adriano 10 Woodmere Road West Caldwell, NJ 07006 / US | 02 /
WEINSTEIN, Jay 191 Bellevue Avenue Upper Montclair, NJ 07043 / US | 03 /
GENTLES, Margaret, Jevnik 68 Day Street Bloomfield, NJ 07003 / US | 04 /
ROSENBLUM, Stuart, Barry 16 Steven Terrance West Orange, NJ 07052 / US | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | Ritter, Stephen David, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91915366.8 | 06.09.1991 | [1993/28] | WO1991US06250 | Priority number, date | US19900579749 | 07.09.1990 Original published format: US 579749 | [1993/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9204328 | Date: | 19.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550464 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D215/56, A61K31/47 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
C07D215/22 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D311/16 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D407/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/28] | Title | German: | ANTI-VIRALE UND ANTI-HYPERTENSIVE VERBINDUNGEN | [1993/28] | English: | ANTIVIRAL COMPOUNDS AND ANTIHYPERTENSIVE COMPOUNDS | [1993/28] | French: | COMPOSES ANTI-VIRAUX ET COMPOSES ANTI-HYPERTENSEURS | [1993/28] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 23.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/12] | 31.10.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0059698 (LEO AB [SE]); | [A]EP0172004 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]); | [A]GB1207771 (WARNER LAMBERT PHARMACEUTICAL [US]); | [X]US3960868 (FERRINI PIER GIORGIO, et al) |