EP0544766 - A PROCESS FOR PREPARING MIDDLE DISTILLATES USING A COMBINATION OF AN INTERMEDIATE PORE SIZE SILICOALUMINOPHOSPHATE MOLECULAR SIEVE CATALYST AND A HYDROCRACKING CATALYST FOR SECOND STAGE HYDROCRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron U.S.A. Inc. 1635 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states CHEVRON U.S.A. Inc. 1635 Market Street Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | ||
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states CHEVRON RESEARCH AND TECHNOLOGY COMPANY P.O. Box 7141 San Francisco, CA 94120-7141 / US | ||
Former [1993/23] | For all designated states CHEVRON RESEARCH COMPANY 555 Market Street, P.O. Box 7141 San Francisco, California 94120-7141 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Stephen, J. 520 45th Avenue San Francisco, CA 94121 / US | [1993/23] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/23] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake & Co. 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91915399.9 | 14.08.1991 | [1993/23] | WO1991US05821 | Priority number, date | US19900570376 | 21.08.1990 Original published format: US 570376 | [1993/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9203519 | Date: | 05.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0544766 | Date: | 09.06.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0544766 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C10G47/12, C10G47/20 | [1993/23] | CPC: |
C10G47/12 (EP);
B01J23/42 (EP);
B01J23/44 (EP);
B01J29/85 (EP);
B01J35/19 (EP);
C10G45/64 (EP);
B01J23/888 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MITTELDESTILLATEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER KOMBINATION EINES SILICOALUMINOPHOSPHAT-MOLEKULARSIEBKATALYSATORS MIT MITTLERER PORENGRÖSSE UND EINES HYDROKRACKKATALYSATORS FÜR HYDROKRACKEN IN DER ZWEITEN STUFE | [1993/23] | English: | A PROCESS FOR PREPARING MIDDLE DISTILLATES USING A COMBINATION OF AN INTERMEDIATE PORE SIZE SILICOALUMINOPHOSPHATE MOLECULAR SIEVE CATALYST AND A HYDROCRACKING CATALYST FOR SECOND STAGE HYDROCRACKING | [1993/23] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE DISTILLAT MOYEN UTILISANT UNE COMBINAISON D'UN CATALYSEUR COMPRENANT UN TAMIS MOLECULAIRE DE SILICOALUMINOPHOSPHATE A TAILLE DES PORES INTERMEDIAIRE ET UN CATALYSEUR D'HYDROCRAQUAGE POUR UN HYDROCRAQUAGE DE SECOND ETAGE | [1993/23] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.1993 | Search fee paid | 15.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4419271 (WARD JOHN W [US]); | [XP]WO9102782 (CHEVRON RES & TECH [US]); | [E]WO9113132 (CHEVRON RES [US]) | International search | [A]US3535225 (JAFFE JOSEPH); | [A]US4859312 (MILLER STEPHEN J [US]); | [A]US4906351 (PELLET REGIS J [US], et al); | [Y]US4913799 (GORTSEMA FRANK P [US], et al); | [Y]US4913798 (GORTSEMA FRANK P [US], et al); | [A]US4960504 (PELLET REGIS J [US], et al); | [A]US4976847 (MAXWELL IAN E [NL], et al); | [A]US4992160 (LONG GARY N [US], et al) |