EP0549625 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE ANATOMICALLY LOCALLY CORRECT ALLOCATION OF THE EXCITATION CENTRES OF BIOMAGNETIC SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/27] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASSLER, Dietrich Flurweg 3 D-8525 Uttenreuth / DE | 02 /
REICHENBERGER, Helmut Begonienstrasse 28 D-8501 Eckental / DE | 03 /
TEMME, Günter Rathsberger Str. 22 D-8521 Spardorf / DE | [1993/27] | Application number, filing date | 91915794.1 | 16.09.1991 | [1993/27] | WO1991DE00731 | Priority number, date | DE19904029581 | 18.09.1990 Original published format: DE 4029581 | [1993/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9204862 | Date: | 02.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0549625 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/04, A61B8/08 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
A61B8/0833 (EP);
A61B5/242 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1993/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ORTSRICHTIGEN ANATOMISCHEN ZUORDNUNG DER ERREGUNGSZENTREN VON BIOMAGNETISCHEN SIGNALEN | [1993/27] | English: | PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR THE ANATOMICALLY LOCALLY CORRECT ALLOCATION OF THE EXCITATION CENTRES OF BIOMAGNETIC SIGNALS | [1993/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'ETABLISSEMENT D'UNE CORRESPONDANCE ANATOMIQUE CORRECTEMENT LOCALISEE DES CENTRES D'EXCITATION DE SIGNAUX BIOMAGNETIQUES | [1993/27] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 06.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/41] | 16.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8807834 (BIOMAGNETIC TECHNOLOGIES [US]); | [Y]EP0301359 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]US4896673 (ROSE FREEMAN H [US], et al) |