EP0542894 - NOVEL SPREAD SPECTRUM CODEC APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.1995 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.06.1995 [1995/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AWARE, INC. One Memorial Drive, 4th Floor Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [1993/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RESNIKOFF, Howard, L. 31 Myopia Road Winchester, MA 01890 / US | 02 /
POLLEN, David 8 Loring Road Lexington, MA 02173 / US | 03 /
LAWTON, Wayne, M. 10 Benedict Avenue Somerville, MA 02145 / US | 04 /
GOPINATH, Ramesh, Ambat 29 Durham Street Somerville, MA 02145 / US | [1993/21] | Representative(s) | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al Bowles Horton Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/21] | Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB | Application number, filing date | 91915797.4 | 24.07.1991 | [1993/21] | WO1991US05228 | Priority number, date | US19900563275 | 06.08.1990 Original published format: US 563275 | [1993/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9203002 | Date: | 20.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0542894 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.02.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04K3/00, H04J13/00 | [1993/27] | CPC: |
H04J13/10 (EP,US);
H04L27/30 (KR);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04L27/0004 (EP,US);
H04J2013/0037 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/21] | H04L27/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/21] | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG EINES SPREIZSPEKTRUMSIGNALS | [1993/21] | English: | NOVEL SPREAD SPECTRUM CODEC APPARATUS AND METHOD | [1993/21] | French: | NOUVEAUX DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE CODAGE ET DECODAGE DE SPECTRE DISPERSE | [1993/21] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.1993 | Search fee paid | 15.02.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 15.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/21] | 21.04.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS June 1989, NY pages 100 - 101 ENDO ET AL 'A High Performance Power Line Spread-Spectrum Modem LSI for Home Bus System' | [A] - SECOND IEE NATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS April 1989, LONDON(GB) pages 111 - 115 O'FARREL 'Code-Division Multiple-Access (CDMA) Techniques in Optical Fibre LAN's' | International search | [A]US4351064 (EWANUS WALTER); | [A]US4894842 (BROEKHOVEN PAUL V [US], et al) |