EP0546044 - ANALYTICAL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OF WALES ABERYSTWYTH Penglais Aberystwyth Dyfed SY23 3DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OF WALES ABERYSTWYTH Penglais Aberystwyth, Dyfed SY23 3DD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELL, Douglas, Bruce Symlog House Cwmsymlog Aberystwyth Dyfed SY23 3HA / GB | 02 /
WOODWARD, Andrew, Michael Calidris Newborough Anglesey Gwynedd LL61 6RS / GB | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Austin, Hedley William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | Austin, Hedley William Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Swansea West Glamorgan SA1 5ED / GB | Application number, filing date | 91915873.3 | 30.08.1991 | [1993/24] | WO1991GB01477 | Priority number, date | GB19900018886 | 30.08.1990 Original published format: GB 9018886 | GB19910011893 | 03.06.1991 Original published format: GB 9111893 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9204630 | Date: | 19.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546044 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0546044 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
G01N33/48735 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/24] | Title | German: | ANALYTISCHES VERFAHREN | [1993/24] | English: | ANALYTICAL METHOD | [1993/24] | French: | PROCEDE D'ANALYSE | [1993/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 12.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 07.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/52] | Request for further processing for: | 18.05.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.06.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.1997 | BE | 02.01.1997 | DK | 02.01.1997 | GR | 02.01.1997 | LU | 31.08.1997 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.01.1997 | |
BE | 02.01.1997 | ||
DK | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | AT | 02.01.1997 | |
BE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 02.01.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]AU520939B (UNISEARCH LTD); | [A]EP0131944 (KERNFORSCHUNGSANLAGE JUELICH [DE]); | [A]WO8908838 (HEALTH LAB SERVICE BOARD [GB]) |