EP0541724 - FLEXIBLE DRIVE TRANSMITTING COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HER, Kenneth, K. 6608 N. Camelot Peoria, IL 61615 / US | 02 /
JONES, Nelson, A. 213 Kickapoo Terrace Peoria, IL 61604 / US | 03 /
BATES, Kent, C. 23119 N. Berchtold Road Chillicothe, IL 61523 / US | [1993/20] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/20] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewuerzmuehlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91916448.3 | 17.06.1991 | [1993/20] | WO1991US04326 | Priority number, date | US19900565078 | 10.08.1990 Original published format: US 565078 | [1993/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9202741 | Date: | 20.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0541724 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.02.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/52, F16D3/77 | [1993/46] | CPC: |
H02K7/003 (EP,US);
F16D3/77 (EP,US);
H02K7/083 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/20] | F16D3/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/20] | Title | German: | FLEXIBELE KUPPLUNG ZUR KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNG | [1993/20] | English: | FLEXIBLE DRIVE TRANSMITTING COUPLING | [1993/20] | French: | ACCOUPLEMENT SOUPLE POUR TRANSMISSION DE PUISSANCE | [1993/20] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1993 | Search fee paid | 04.02.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 04.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 02.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3837187 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]DE1199579 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US1571746 (WEMP ERNEST E) | International search | [Y]US3183731 (JOHN DOLZA); | [A]US2627733 (AMBERG WALTER E); | [Y]US2564103 (GALLAGHER WILLIAM P); | [A]US2556293 (NORDT JR PAUL W); | [A]GB779357 (BRITISH THOMSON HOUSTON CO LTD); | [Y]GB733885 (SVENSKA ROTOR MASKINER AB) |