EP0503026 - METHOD OF DETERMINING THE OBLIQUE-MOTION ANGLE OF A BRAKED VEHICLE AND/OR THE LATERAL MOTION FORCE ACTING ON THE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHRET, Thomas Hindenburgstr. 33 D-7633 Seelbach / DE | 02 /
HARTMANN, Uwe Olgastr. 79 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | 03 /
LUTZ, Albert Tulpenstr. 8 D-7142 Marbach/Neckar / DE | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/06] |
Former [1992/38] | Kammer, Arno, Dipl.-Ing. ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 91916578.7 | 26.09.1991 | [1992/38] | WO1991EP01841 | Priority number, date | DE19904030653 | 28.09.1990 Original published format: DE 4030653 | [1992/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9205987 | Date: | 16.04.1992 | [1992/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0503026 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503026 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/00 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
B60T8/17552 (EP,US);
B62D6/04 (EP,US);
B60T2230/02 (EP,US);
B60T2270/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1992/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESTIMMEN DER SCHRÄGLAUFWINKEL UND/ODER DER SEITENFÜHRUNGSKRÄFTE EINES GEBREMSTEN FAHRZEUGS | [1992/38] | English: | METHOD OF DETERMINING THE OBLIQUE-MOTION ANGLE OF A BRAKED VEHICLE AND/OR THE LATERAL MOTION FORCE ACTING ON THE VEHICLE | [1992/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE DETERMINATION DE L'OBLIQUITE ET/OU DE LA STABILITE LATERALE D'UN VEHICULE FREINE | [1992/38] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.1992 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 24.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0152602 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [Y]DE3923599 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [Y]WO9006251 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [AP]DE3935588 (FORSCHUNGSGESELLSCHAFT KRAFTFA [DE]) | by applicant | WO9006251 |