EP0546085 - DIRECT FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLATZ, Philip, Strubing Box 3594 Greenville, DE 19807 / US | 02 /
RICHARDSON, Paul, Noel 11 North Wynwyd Drive Newark, DE 19711 / US | 03 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Pallatheri, Manackal 110 Cameron Drive Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | 04 /
SAXTON, Ronald, Luther 374 Chatham Road West Grove, PA 19390 / US | [1993/24] | Representative(s) | Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | Freiherr von Wittgenstein, Arved, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91916877.3 | 15.08.1991 | [1993/24] | WO1991US05591 | Priority number, date | US19900575545 | 27.08.1990 Original published format: US 575545 | US19900575547 | 27.08.1990 Original published format: US 575547 | US19900623581 | 07.12.1990 Original published format: US 623581 | US19910655485 | 14.02.1991 Original published format: US 655485 | [1993/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9203274 | Date: | 05.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0546085 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.03.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/03, B29C45/50, B29C45/60, B29C49/06 | [1993/24] | CPC: |
B29C45/60 (EP);
B29C45/03 (KR);
B29B7/429 (EP);
B29C45/50 (EP);
B29C48/56 (EP);
B29C48/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/24] | Title | German: | DIREKTE HERSTELLUNG | [1993/24] | English: | DIRECT FABRICATION | [1993/24] | French: | FABRICATION DIRECTE | [1993/24] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.1993 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.1993 | Search fee paid | 17.02.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: LU | 17.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/51] | 26.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58207936 ; | [A]DE3910132 (SCHWERIN PLASTMASCHINEN [DD]); | [A]FR2327049 (SANDRETTO SAS [IT]); | [A]US2607077 (DULMAGE FREDERICK E); | [A]JPS473015B ; | [A]GB2178997 (TOSHIBA MACHINE CO LTD); | [A]EP0332772 (DU PONT [US]) | [A] - JAPAN PLASTICS AGE vol. 13, no. 5/6, May 1975, TOKYO pages 29 - 46 K. MURAKAMI 'Mixing and Kneading with Screw Extrusion and DIS Screw' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 52 (C-213)9 March 1984 & JP-A-58 207 936 ( MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK ) 3 December 1983, & JP58207936 A 19831203 | International search | [X]US4172859 (EPSTEIN BENNETT N [US]); | [X]US4174358 (EPSTEIN BENNETT N [US]); | [P]US5013233 (SEMMEKROT GERARDUS J M [NL]); | [Y]JPS5734936 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [P]US5026512 (CHANG SHAO C [JP]); | [A]US4908169 (GALIC GEORGE J [US], et al); | [A]US4770837 (LU PANG-CHIA [US], et al); | [A]US4784819 (SPURR ROBERT [US]) |