EP0504415 - CONTROL SYSTEM OF HYDRAULIC PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE, Hiroshi 1082-66, Tagucho Ushiku-shi, Ibaraki 300-12 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Yasuo 146-3, Syouei Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 03 /
IZUMI, Eiki 2613-343, Shimoinayoshi, Chiyoda-mura Niihari-gun, Ibaraki 315 / JP | 04 /
ONOUE, Hiroshi Tsukuba-Ryo, 2625, Shimoinayoshi, Chiyoda-mura Niihari-gun, Ibaraki 315 / JP | 05 /
NAKAMURA, Shigetaka 1-3, Manabe 4-chome Tsuchiura-shi, Ibaraki 300 / JP | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/39] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91917019.1 | 27.09.1991 | [1992/39] | WO1991JP01296 | Priority number, date | JP19900259712 | 28.09.1990 Original published format: JP 25971290 | [1992/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9206306 | Date: | 16.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504415 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504415 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.04.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/00, F15B11/08, F15B11/16, F04B49/00, E02F9/22 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
F15B21/087 (EP,US);
E02F9/2228 (EP,US);
E02F9/2235 (EP,US);
E02F9/2296 (EP,US);
F04B49/065 (EP,US);
F15B11/05 (EP,US);
F15B11/165 (EP,US);
F04B2201/12041 (EP,US);
F04B2205/05 (EP,US);
F04B2205/10 (EP,US);
F04B2207/01 (EP,US);
F04B2207/042 (EP,US);
F04B2207/044 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20546 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20553 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20592 (EP,US);
F15B2211/26 (EP,US);
F15B2211/30535 (EP,US);
F15B2211/324 (EP,US);
F15B2211/351 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6054 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6309 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6313 (EP,US);
F15B2211/633 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6333 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6346 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6355 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/39] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR HYDRAULISCHE PUMPE | [1995/34] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM OF HYDRAULIC PUMP | [1992/39] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE POUR POMPE HYDRAULIQUE | [1992/39] |
Former [1992/39] | Steuerungssystem für hydraulische Pumpe | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.1992 | Translation filed | 28.04.1992 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.1992 | Search fee paid | 28.04.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 08.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0440802 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) | International search | [A]WO9102167 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]); | [A]JPS6188002 (DANFOSS AS) | Examination | JPH06188002 | JPH01141203 |