EP0550580 - URACIL REDUCTASE INACTIVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/28] | URACIL REDUCTASE INACTIVATORS | ||
[1999/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | ||
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states THE WELLCOME FOUNDATION LIMITED Unicorn House 160 Euston Road London NW1 2BP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPECTOR, Thomas Route 7, PO Box 59 Durham, NC 27707 / US | 02 /
PORTER, David, John, Timothy 8512 Sawyer Drive Raleigh, NC 27613 / US | 03 /
RAHIM, Saad, George Langley Court Beckenham Kent BR3 3BS / GB | [1993/28] | Representative(s) | Filler, Wendy Anne, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/42] | Filler, Wendy Anne, Dr., et al Glaxo Wellcome plc Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | ||
Former [1993/28] | Chapman, Paul William, et al The Wellcome Foundation Limited, Langley Court Beckenham, Kent BR3 3BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91917260.1 | 25.09.1991 | [1993/28] | WO1991GB01650 | Priority number, date | GB19900020930 | 26.09.1990 Original published format: GB 9020930 | [1993/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9204901 | Date: | 02.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550580 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0550580 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, A61K31/70, C07D239/54 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K31/7072 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/0031 (EP,US);
A61K9/1623 (EP,US);
A61K9/1635 (EP,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61K9/48 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/505, A61K31/505 (US,EP);
A61K31/7072, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/7072, A61K31/7072, A61K31/505 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/28] | Title | German: | URACIL-REDUCTASE-INAKTIVATOR | [1999/10] | English: | URACIL REDUCTASE INACTIVATOR | [1999/10] | French: | INACTIVATEUR DE REDUCTASE URACILE | [1999/10] |
Former [1993/28] | URACIL-REDUCTASE-INAKTIVATOREN | ||
Former [1993/28] | URACIL REDUCTASE INACTIVATORS | ||
Former [1993/28] | INACTIVATEURS DE REDUCTASE URACILE | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP99202472.9 / EP0985415 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4719214 (SHEALY Y FULMER [US], et al); | [X]EP0272065 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [X]US4863927 (TOLMAN RICHARD L [US], et al); | [X]EP0356166 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [X]EP0371139 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]); | [XP]EP0409575 (UNIV BIRMINGHAM [GB]) | [X] - Chemical Abstracts, volume 107, no. 21, 23 November 1987, (Columbus, Ohio, US), Tatsumi, Kunihiko et al : "Inhibitory effects of pyrimidine, barbituric acid and pyridine derivatives on 5-fluorouracil degradation in rat liver extracts ", see page 28, abstract 190461z, & Jpn.J.Cancer Res.(GANN) 1987, 78( 7), 748- 75 | [X] - Chemical Abstracts, volume 104, no. 3, 20 January 1986, (Columbus, Ohio, US), Tuchman, Mendel et al : "Effects of uridine and thymidine on the degradation of 5-fluorouracil, uracil, and thymine by rat liver dihydropyrimidine dehydrogenase. ", see page 28, abstract 14633m, & Cancer Res. 1985, 45(11), 5553-555 | [X] - NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, Vol. 3, No. 10, 1976 P.J. Barr et al: "Incorporation of 5-substituted uracil derivatives into nucleic acids. Part IV. The synthesis of 5-ethynyluracil. ", | [X] - CANCER RESEARCH, Vol. 46, 1986 Claude Desgranges et al: "Effect of (E)-5-(2-Bromovinyl)uracil on the Catabolism and Antitumor Activity of 5-Fluorouracil in Rats and Leukemic Mice ", |