EP0503100 - SEMICONDUCTOR MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | ||
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMITA, Naoto Dai-2 Matsuba-sou 5 240, Sanmaicho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 221 / JP | 02 /
MIYAMOTO, Junichi 304-9, Kidencho Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 247 / JP | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91917343.5 | 02.10.1991 | [1992/38] | WO1991JP01323 | Priority number, date | JP19900264108 | 02.10.1990 Original published format: JP 26410890 | [1992/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9206475 | Date: | 16.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0503100 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503100 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.04.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11C29/00, G11C11/408, G11C16/06 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
G11C29/70 (EP,US);
G11C29/24 (EP,US);
G11C29/50 (EP,US);
G11C29/78 (EP,US);
G11C11/401 (EP,US);
G11C16/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1998/25] |
Former [1992/38] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | HALBLEITERSPEICHER | [1992/38] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR MEMORY | [1992/38] | French: | MEMOIRE A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [1992/38] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.1992 | Translation filed | 02.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.1992 | Search fee paid | 02.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0131930 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0283908 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-11 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 38 * [A] 13,14; | [XP]EP0427260 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-14* column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 53 *; | [XA] - R. KRAUS ET AL., "Design for Test of MBIT DRAMs", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1989 INTERNATIONAL TEST CONFERENCE, WASHINGTON DC, US, (19890829), pages 316 - 321, XP000089960 [X] 1-6,8-11 * page 316, column R, line 1 - page 317, column L, line 6 * [A] 13,14 | International search | [A]JPS61289600 (FUJITSU LTD); | [X]JPS6381700 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JPH01112598 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [X]JPH01133297 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [P]JPH0322300 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP) |