Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0551362
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.10.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] |
01.11.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] |
18.10.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.07.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.03.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.03.1996 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
26.03.1996 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
20.03.1996 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
16.01.1996 |
Application refused |
|
27.09.1995 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.11.1995 [1995/46] |
18.07.1994 |
First examination report |
|
21.06.1994 |
Change - representative |
published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] |
03.06.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] |
03.06.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] |