Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0440495 | Global Dossier | 24.08.1994 | B1 | EP0440495 | 22.04.1992 | A3 | EP0440495 | 07.08.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2282490 | 01.02.1990 | JP27189890 | 09.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0504431 | Global Dossier | 20.03.1996 | B1 | EP0504431 | 10.03.1993 | A4 | EP0504431 | 23.09.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9101374 | 09.10.1991 | JP27089890 | 09.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2070839 | 05.02.2002 | C | CA2070839 | 10.04.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP27189890 | 09.10.1990 | JP9101374 | 09.10.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69103541T | 09.03.1995 | T2 | DE69103541D1 | 29.09.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2282490 | 01.02.1990 | JP27189890 | 09.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69118164T | 24.10.1996 | T2 | DE69118164D1 | 25.04.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP9101374 | 09.10.1991 | JP27089890 | 09.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2552389B | 13.11.1996 | B2 | JPH03267918 | 28.11.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2282490 | 01.02.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0130058B | 11.04.1998 | B1 | KR920000045 | 10.01.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2282490 | 01.02.1990 | JP27189890 | 09.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100229687B | 15.11.1999 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP9101374 | 09.10.1991 | JP27089890 | 09.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW215129B | 21.10.1993 | B | Priority number | Date | JP2282490 | 01.02.1990 | JP27189890 | 09.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5187599 | 16.02.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2282490 | 01.02.1990 | JP27189890 | 09.10.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5378317 | 03.01.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US85370292 | 08.06.1992 | US11064693 | 23.08.1993 | JP9101374 | 09.10.1991 | JP27089890 | 09.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9206489 | Global Dossier | 16.04.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP27089890 | 09.10.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3152430B | 03.04.2001 | B2 | JPH04146616 | 20.05.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP27089890 | 09.10.1990 |