EP0504431 - METHOD OF REMOVING ORGANIC COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHLORINE ENGINEERS CORP., LTD. Shosen Mitsui Building, No. 1-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states CHLORINE ENGINEERS CORP., Ltd. Shosen Mitsui Building, No. 1-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASHIWASE, Masaharu 478-5, Shinbou Okayama-shi, Okayama 700 / JP | 02 /
MATSUOKA, Terumi 27-13, Toushinden Okayama-shi, Okayama 700 / JP | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Dixon, Donald Cossar, et al Wilson Gunn Gee Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | Dixon, Donald Cossar, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | ||
Former [1992/39] | Diamond, Bryan Clive Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91917693.3 | 09.10.1991 | [1992/39] | WO1991JP01374 | Priority number, date | JP19900270898 | 09.10.1990 Original published format: JP 27089890 | [1992/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9206489 | Date: | 16.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504431 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504431 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.04.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/42, H01L21/311 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
H01L21/31133 (EP);
G03F7/423 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/39] | H01L21/027 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN ORGANISCHER ÜBERZÜGE | [1992/39] | English: | METHOD OF REMOVING ORGANIC COATING | [1992/39] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELIMINATION DE REVETEMENTS ORGANIQUES | [1992/39] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.1992 | Translation filed | 29.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.1992 | Search fee paid | 29.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 23.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57062530 ; | [A]EP0311817 ; | [A]EP0259985 ; | [A]FR2231110 ; | [A]EP0344764 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 136 (E-120)23 July 1982 & JP-A-57 062 530 ( HITACHI ), & JP57062530 A 19820723 | International search | [A]JPS62213127 ; | [A]JPS648630 ; | [A]JPS6476726 |