EP0565527 - FORCE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BONNEVILLE SCIENTIFIC INCORPORATED 918 East 900 South Salt Lake City, Utah 84105 / US | [1997/02] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states BONNEVILLE SCIENTIFIC, INC. 918 East 900 South Salt Lake City, Utah 84105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAHN, Allen, R. 918 East 900 South Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano, et al C/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1993/42] | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 91917992.9 | 29.08.1991 | [1993/42] | WO1991US06213 | Priority number, date | US19910638044 | 04.01.1991 Original published format: US 638044 | [1993/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9212407 | Date: | 23.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565527 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565527 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0565527 | Date: | 24.09.1997 | [1997/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.07.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/16 | [1993/42] | CPC: |
G01L1/247 (EP,US);
G01L1/255 (EP,US);
G01L5/166 (EP,US);
G01L5/167 (EP,US);
G01L5/173 (EP,US);
G01L5/228 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/42] | Title | German: | KRAFTWANDLER | [1993/42] | English: | FORCE SENSOR | [1993/42] | French: | CAPTEUR DE FORCE | [1993/42] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.1993 | Search fee paid | 02.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 02.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 04.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Request for further processing for: | 15.02.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 15.02.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 11.09.1997 | [1998/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4634917 (DVORSKY JAMES E [US], et al); | [Y]US4839512 (SPECK RICHARD P [US]) | [Y] - ROBOTS 8 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS - FUTURE CONSIDERATIONS - VOLUME 2 4 June 1984, DETROIT (US) pages 1 - 18 A.R. GRAHN ET AL. 'ROBOTIC ULTRASONIC FORCE SENSOR ARRAYS' | International search | [A]US4555953 (DARIO PAOLO [IT], et al); | [A]US4704909 (GRAHN ALLEN R [US], et al); | [A]US4744253 (HERMKENS GERARDUS A J [NL]); | [A]US4964302 (GRAHN ALLEN R [US], et al) |