EP0555263 - DEVICE FOR COATING WORKPIECES USED IN THE DENTAL FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRAMM, Gerhard Waldstrasse 24 D-75233 Tiefenbronn / DE | [1993/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/33] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | Jeck, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. Markgröninger Strasse 47/1 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 91918273.3 | 26.10.1991 | [1993/33] | WO1991EP02026 | Priority number, date | DE19904034349 | 29.10.1990 Original published format: DE 4034349 | [1993/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9207977 | Date: | 14.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0555263 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0555263 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C25D21/12 | [1993/33] | CPC: |
C25D21/12 (EP);
A61C13/0006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [1993/33] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON ÜBERZÜGEN BEI WERKSTÜCKEN IM DENTALEN BEREICH | [1993/33] | English: | DEVICE FOR COATING WORKPIECES USED IN THE DENTAL FIELD | [1993/33] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'APPLICATION DE REVETEMENTS SUR DES PIECES DANS LE DOMAINE DENTAIRE | [1993/33] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.02.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP63143296 ; | [X]JP61143599 ; | [X]GB875595 (ETHER LANGHAM THOMPSON LTD); | [X]GB1144756 (INGRAM & GLASS LTD); | [X]US3627648 (WAGGENER HERBERT A) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 405 (C-539)(3252) 26. Oktober 1988 & JP,A,63 143 296 ( FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD ) 15. Juni 1988 siehe Zusammenfassung, & JP63143296 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 339 (C-385)(2395) 15. November 1986 & JP,A,61 143 599 ( TOSHIHARU NAKAI ) 1. Juli 1986 siehe Zusammenfassung, & JP61143599 A 00000000 |