EP0553229 - IMPROVEMENT IN SOLID PHASE BINDING ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia Biosensor AB 751 82 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/31] | For all designated states Pharmacia Biosensor AB S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÖFAS, Stefan Svartbäcksgatan 99 A S-753 35 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
RÖNNBERG, Inger Salagatan 41 B S-753 26 Uppsala / SE | 03 /
LAGERSTRÖM, Katarina Torkelsgatan 2 B S-753 26 Uppsala / SE | [1993/31] | Representative(s) | Widén, Björn, et al Pharmacia & Upjohn AB Patent Department 751 82 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Widén, Björn, et al Pharmacia & Upjohn AB Patent Department 751 82 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [1993/31] | Widén, Björn, et al Kabi Pharmacia AB Patent Department S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 91919324.3 | 26.09.1991 | [1993/31] | WO1991SE00649 | Priority number, date | GB19900003122 | 01.10.1990 Original published format: GB 9003122 | [1993/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9206380 | Date: | 16.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0553229 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0553229 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/545, G01N33/53 | [1993/31] | CPC: |
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
G01N33/6878 (EP,US);
G01N33/76 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/31] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG BEI FESTPHASENBINDUNGS-ANALYSENVERFAHREN | [1993/31] | English: | IMPROVEMENT IN SOLID PHASE BINDING ASSAY | [1993/31] | French: | AMELIORATION RELATIVE AU DOSAGE FAISANT APPEL A UNE LIAISON EN PHASE SOLIDE | [1993/31] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1993 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/31] | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.02.1996 | BE | 07.02.1996 | DK | 07.02.1996 | ES | 07.02.1996 | GR | 07.02.1996 | NL | 07.02.1996 | SE | 07.05.1996 | LU | 30.09.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
BE | 07.02.1996 | ||
DK | 07.02.1996 | ||
ES | 07.02.1996 | ||
GR | 07.02.1996 | ||
SE | 07.05.1996 | ||
LU | 30.09.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
BE | 07.02.1996 | ||
DK | 07.02.1996 | ||
GR | 07.02.1996 | ||
SE | 07.05.1996 | ||
LU | 30.09.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
BE | 07.02.1996 | ||
DK | 07.02.1996 | ||
SE | 07.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
BE | 07.02.1996 | ||
SE | 07.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 07.02.1996 | |
SE | 07.05.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8302954 (VENTREX LAB INC [US]); | [A]WO9005303 (PHARMACIA AB [SE]); | [A]US4829009 (GRAVES HOWARD [US]); | [PA]EP0406473 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) | [A] - Dialog Information Service, file 155: MEDLINE 66-91 April, Accession No. 88285764, HC GRAVES et al.: "The effect of surface charge on non-specific binding of rabbit immunoglobulin G in solid-phase immunoassays", & J Immunol Methods Jul 22 1988, 111 (2) pages 157-66. | by applicant | WO9005303 |