EP0559670 - CAP FOR A SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUGGEMOS, Horst Sonnleitenweg 33 A-8043 Graz / AT | [1993/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/37] | Representative(s) | Brauneiss, Leo Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Dipl.-Ing Gerhard Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 Postfach 281 1031 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Brauneiss, Leo, Dipl.Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Dipl.-Ing Gerhard Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 Postfach 281 A-1031 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1993/37] | Brauneiss, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 Postfach 281 A-1031 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 91919602.2 | 23.10.1991 | [1993/37] | WO1991AT00114 | Priority number, date | AT19900002392 | 26.11.1990 Original published format: AT 239290 | [1993/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9209753 | Date: | 11.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0559670 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0559670 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/14 | [1993/37] | CPC: |
E02D29/14 (EP,US);
E02D29/149 (EP,US);
E03F5/08 (EP,US);
F16K24/046 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6995 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/37] | Title | German: | EINSATZTEIL FÜR EINEN SCHACHT | [1993/37] | English: | CAP FOR A SHAFT | [1993/37] | French: | INSERT POUR UN PUITS | [1993/37] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.1993 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 11.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 16.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/14] | Request for further processing for: | 04.02.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 04.02.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP60215928 ; | [A]JP59233029 ; | [A]US3712009 (CAMPAGNA B); | [A]US3173442 (MCKILLIP WILLARD M); | [A]DE3516277 (BECK ERHARD); | [A]US4650365 (RUNNELS FRANKLIN D [US]); | [A]US4067659 (CAMPAGNA JR SAMUEL A, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 73 (M-463)(2130) 22. März 1986 & JP,A,60 215 928 ( NITSUSHIYOU KOUSAN KK ) 29. Oktober 1985 siehe Zusammenfassung, & JP60215928 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 111 (M-379)(1834) 15. Mai 1985 & JP,A,59 233 029 ( NITSUSHIYOU KOUSAN KK ) 27. Dezember 1984 siehe Zusammenfassung, & JP59233029 A 00000000 |