EP0558553 - BROWNING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.01.1996 [1996/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017-5755 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017-5755 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, James, M. 8 Lisa Lane Uncasville, CT 06382 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Ping, W. 11 Trumbull Road Waterford, CT 06385 / US | 03 /
MACRI, Christopher, A. 8 Blackwell Lane Old Lyme, CT 06371 / US | 04 /
MILLER, James, W. 39 Barton Lane Ledyard, CT 06339 / US | 05 /
SARGES, Divina, V. 1063 River Road Mystic, CT 06355 / US | [1993/36] | Representative(s) | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/36] | Wood, David John, et al PFIZER LIMITED, Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91920059.2 | 03.10.1991 | [1993/36] | WO1991US07154 | Priority number, date | US19900608511 | 02.11.1990 Original published format: US 608511 | [1993/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9207477 | Date: | 14.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0558553 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/275, A23P1/08, A23L1/31, A23L1/01, A23L1/22 | [1993/36] | CPC: |
A23L13/03 (EP,US);
A23L5/43 (EP,KR,US);
A23L27/80 (EP,US);
A23L29/10 (KR);
A23L29/20 (KR);
A23L5/19 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/36] | Title | German: | BRÄUNUNGZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1993/36] | English: | BROWNING COMPOSITION | [1993/36] | French: | COMPOSITION SERVANT A DORER LES ALIMENTS | [1993/36] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 06.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 13.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/05] | 08.09.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB669363 (HAROLD A HOFFMAN); | [Y]US3406081 (BAUER CLIFFORD D, et al); | [A]US3586512 (MANCUSO JOHN J, et al); | [X]EP0005290 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [Y]GB2038607 (NAT CAN CORP); | [X]US4330566 (MEYER RICHARD, et al); | [A]US4963376 (NAFISI-MOVAGHAR KARIM [US]); | [A]WO9012513 (PILLSBURY CO [US]) | [Y] - K.KULP, R.LOEWE 'batters and breadings in food processing' 1990 , AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF CEREAL CHEMISTS , ST PAUL , MINNESOTA, USA Pages 117-125 see table 3 see page 123 |