EP0515596 - AUTOMATIC PRODUCT FEED SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING A MILL ROLLER FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler AG 9240 Uzwil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/49] | For all designated states Bühler AG CH-9240 Uzwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSTETTLER, René Oberdorfstrasse 15 CH-8370 Sirnach / CH | 02 /
MAECHLER, Ernst Zuckenrietstrasse CH-9524 Zuzwil / CH | [1992/49] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1995/26] |
Former [1992/49] | Ackermann, Ernst Egghalden CH-9231 Egg-Flawil / CH | Application number, filing date | 91920198.8 | 05.12.1991 | [1992/49] | WO1991CH00248 | Priority number, date | CH19900003931 | 12.12.1990 Original published format: CH 393190 | [1992/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9210295 | Date: | 25.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0515596 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0515596 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B02C4/28, B02C4/32, B02C25/00 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
B02C4/32 (EP,US);
B02C4/286 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/49] | Title | German: | PRODUKTSPEISEAUTOMATIK UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES MÜLLEREIWALZENSTUHLES | [1992/49] | English: | AUTOMATIC PRODUCT FEED SYSTEM AND PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING A MILL ROLLER FRAME | [1992/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION AUTOMATIQUE DE PRODUITS ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN MOULIN A CYLINDRE DE MEUNERIE | [1992/49] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 24.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0038054 ; | [A]WO8605416 (BUEHLER AG GEB [CH]) |