EP0593484 - A METHOD AND AN ARRANGEMENT FOR PRODUCING SPUNLACE MATERIAL, AND MATERIAL PRODUCED THEREBY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MÖLNLYCKE AKTIEBOLAG S-405 03 Göteborg / SE | [1994/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BILLGREN, Tomas PL 3560 S-430 41 Kullavik / SE | 02 /
HELLSTRÖM, Jeanette Egnahemsvägen 26C S-413 21 Göteborg / SE | [1994/17] | Representative(s) | Kierkegaard, Lars-Olov Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/17] | Kierkegaard, Lars-Olov H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 91920263.0 | 18.11.1991 | [1994/17] | WO1991SE00779 | Priority number, date | SE19900003676 | 19.11.1990 Original published format: SE 9003676 | [1994/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9208832 | Date: | 29.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0593484 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0593484 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/46 | [1994/17] | CPC: |
D04H1/74 (EP,US);
D04H1/425 (EP,US);
D04H1/4374 (EP,US);
D04H1/43835 (EP,US);
D04H1/44 (EP,US);
D04H1/492 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR SPINNVLIESHERSTELLUNG UND FERTIGERZEUGNISSE | [1994/17] | English: | A METHOD AND AN ARRANGEMENT FOR PRODUCING SPUNLACE MATERIAL, AND MATERIAL PRODUCED THEREBY | [1994/17] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION SERVANT A FABRIQUER UN MATERIAU FILE NON-TISSE, ET MATERIAU AINSI FABRIQUE | [1994/17] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 30.04.1993 | Examination requested [1994/17] | 24.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE1435125 ; | [XY]GB2114174 (UNI CHARM CORP); | [XY]SE429350 (KENDALL & CO [US]); | [Y]SE431567 (KENDALL & CO [US]); | [Y]EP0108621 (DU PONT [US]) |