EP0557401 - EROSION CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LARCHER, Marc 11, cours Xavier-Arnozan F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | [1993/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARCHER, Marc 11, cours Xavier-Arnozan F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | 02 /
DIAS, Alain Avenue de la Côte-d'Argent F-33380 Marcheprime / FR | [1993/35] | Application number, filing date | 91920730.8 | 12.11.1991 | [1993/35] | WO1991FR00887 | Priority number, date | FR19900014008 | 12.11.1990 Original published format: FR 9014008 | [1993/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9208848 | Date: | 29.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0557401 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0557401 | Date: | 07.05.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E02B3/12, E02B3/06, E02D17/20, E02B3/14 | [1993/35] | CPC: |
E02B3/126 (EP,US);
E02B3/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/35] | Title | German: | EROSIONSSCHUTZANORDNUNG | [1993/35] | English: | EROSION CONTROL DEVICE | [1993/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE DE L'EROSION | [1993/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.1993 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 08.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/35] | 21.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.05.1994 | 30.11.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.05.1995 | 30.11.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.05.1997 | DK | 07.05.1997 | GR | 07.05.1997 | IT | 07.05.1997 | SE | 07.08.1997 | LU | 12.11.1997 | [2008/02] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 07.05.1997 | |
DK | 07.05.1997 | ||
GR | 07.05.1997 | ||
IT | 07.05.1997 | ||
SE | 07.08.1997 | ||
LU | 12.11.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 07.05.1997 | |
DK | 07.05.1997 | ||
GR | 07.05.1997 | ||
IT | 07.05.1997 | ||
SE | 07.08.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 07.05.1997 | |
DK | 07.05.1997 | ||
IT | 07.05.1997 | ||
SE | 07.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 07.05.1997 | |
DK | 07.05.1997 | ||
SE | 07.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 07.05.1997 | |
SE | 07.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 07.05.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO8103189 (LARSEN O); | [A]DE3212411 (BETON GANDLGRUBER GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]GB2160246 (O HEA ADRIAN RALPH); | [Y]EP0308562 (SHIMIZU CONSTRUCTION CO LTD [JP]) |