EP0513390 - POROUS HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE OF POLYETHYLENE AND PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/47] | LARGE-PORE-DIAMETER POROUS HOLLOW YARN MEMBRANE OF POLYETHYLENE, PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND HYDROPHILIC POROUS HOLLOW YARN MEMBRANE OF POLYETHYLENE | ||
[1996/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.1997 [1997/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMO, Jun, Central Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi, HHiroshima 739-06 / JP | 02 /
HIRAI, Takayuki, Central Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Hiroshi, Central Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | 04 /
KONDO, Kenji, Central Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | [1993/04] |
Former [1992/47] | 01 /
KAMO, Jun, Central Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi, HHiroshima 739-06 / JP | ||
02 /
HIRAI, Takayuki, Central Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKAHASHI, Hiroshi, Central Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | |||
04 /
KONDO, kenji, Central Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd., 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi, Hiroshima 739-06 / JP | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91920823.1 | 28.11.1991 | [1992/47] | WO1991JP01638 | Priority number, date | JP19900327279 | 28.11.1990 Original published format: JP 32727990 | JP19910162354 | 07.06.1991 Original published format: JP 16235491 | [1992/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9209359 | Date: | 11.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0513390 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0513390 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.06.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D69/08, B01D69/02, B01D67/00, B01D71/26, D01D5/24, D01F6/04 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
B01D67/0088 (EP,US);
B01D67/0027 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D69/08 (EP,US);
B01D71/261 (EP,US);
B29C55/005 (EP,US);
D01D5/247 (EP,US);
B01D2323/02 (EP,US);
B01D2323/081 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/47] | B01D71/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/47] | Title | German: | PORÖSE HOHLFASERMEMBRAN AUS POLYETHYLEN UND IHRE HERSTELLUNG | [1996/07] | English: | POROUS HOLLOW FIBER MEMBRANE OF POLYETHYLENE AND PRODUCTION THEREOF | [1996/07] | French: | MEMBRANE DE FIBRE CREUSE POREUSE DE POLYETHYLENE ET SA PRODUCTION | [1996/07] |
Former [1992/47] | PORÖSE HOHLGARNMEMBRAN AUS POLYETHYLEN MIT GROSSEM PORENDURCHMESSER, IHRE HERSTELLUNG SOWIE HYDROPHILE PORÖSE HOHLGARNMEMBRAN AUS POLYETHYLEN | ||
Former [1992/47] | LARGE-PORE-DIAMETER POROUS HOLLOW YARN MEMBRANE OF POLYETHYLENE, PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND HYDROPHILIC POROUS HOLLOW YARN MEMBRANE OF POLYETHYLENE | ||
Former [1992/47] | MEMBRANE EN POLYETHYLENE A FIL CREUX POREUX D'UN GRAND DIAMETRE DE PORE, SA PRODUCTION ET MEMBRANE EN POLYETHYLENE A FIL CREUX POREUX HYDROPHILE | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.1992 | Translation filed | 28.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.1992 | Search fee paid | 28.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 27.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0050399 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]); | [A]US4696748 (NITADORI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al); | [A]DE3821591 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS5742919 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [A]JPS61271003 (ASAHI MEDICAL CO); | [A]JPS63190602 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) |