EP0561846 - 4,5-DIHYDROXY- AND 4,5,8-TRIHYDROXY- 9,10-DIHYDRO-9,10-DIOXO-2-ANTHRACENECARBOXYLIC ACID DICARBONATES AND URETHANS HAVING THERAPEUTICAL ACTIVITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISTITUTO GENTILI S.p.A. Via Mazzini, 112 56125 Pisa / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | For all designated states ISTITUTO GENTILI S.p.A. Via Mazzini, 112 I-56100 Pisa / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSINI, Sergio Via Mazzini, 112 I-56100 Pisa / IT | 02 /
MIAN, Maurizio Via G.Bruno, 69 I-56100 Pisa / IT | [1993/39] | Representative(s) | Bianchetti, Giuseppe Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Bianchetti, Giuseppe Studio Consulenza Brevettuale, Via Rossini, 8 I-20122 Milan / IT | Application number, filing date | 91920850.4 | 03.12.1991 | [1993/39] | WO1991EP02290 | Priority number, date | IT19390002234 | 11.12.1990 Original published format: IT 223439 | [1993/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9210464 | Date: | 25.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0561846 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0561846 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/96, A61K31/215, C07C271/44, C07C323/12, A61K31/325 | [1993/39] | CPC: |
C07C323/12 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07C271/44 (EP,US);
C07C69/96 (EP,US);
C07C2603/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/39] | Title | German: | 4,5-DIHYDROXY UND 4,5,8-TRIHYDROXY-9,10-DIOXO-2-ANTHRACENCARBONSÄURE-DIKOHLENSÄUREESTER UND URETHANE MIT THERAPEUTISCHER WIRKUNG | [1993/39] | English: | 4,5-DIHYDROXY- AND 4,5,8-TRIHYDROXY- 9,10-DIHYDRO-9,10-DIOXO-2-ANTHRACENECARBOXYLIC ACID DICARBONATES AND URETHANS HAVING THERAPEUTICAL ACTIVITIES | [1993/39] | French: | DICARBONATES ET URETHANES D'ACIDE 9,10-DIHYDRO-9,10-DIOXO-2-ANTHRACENECARBOXYLIQUE 4,5-DIHYDROXY- ET 4,5,8-TRIHYDROXY-, PRESENTANT DES ACTIVITES THERAPEUTIQUES | [1993/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 04.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/39] | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 22.03.1995 | AT | 03.12.1995 | DK | 03.12.1995 | GB | 03.12.1995 | SE | 04.12.1995 | [2000/05] |
Former [1997/28] | AT | 03.12.1995 | |
DK | 03.12.1995 | ||
GB | 03.12.1995 | ||
SE | 04.12.1995 | ||
Former [1997/17] | DK | 03.12.1995 | |
GB | 03.12.1995 | ||
SE | 04.12.1995 | ||
Former [1997/03] | DK | 03.12.1995 | |
GB | 03.12.1995 | ||
SE | 04.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/47] | GB | 03.12.1995 | |
SE | 04.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/42] | SE | 04.12.1995 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2711493 (FRIEDMANN CHARLES AUBREY); | [X]FR2508798 (PROTER SPA [IT]); | [X]EP0243968 (PROTER SPA [IT]) |