EP0531461 - BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE PEPTIDES CONTAINING D-2-ALKYLTRYPTOPHAN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.1995 [1995/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEGHENGHI, Romano Chesaux Dessus B1 CH-1264 S.-Cergue / CH | [1993/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Minoja, Fabrizio Studio Consulenza Brevettuale, Via Rossini, 8 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91920995.7 | 17.04.1991 | [1993/11] | WO1991EP00727 | Priority number, date | IT19900020273 | 11.05.1990 Original published format: IT 2027390 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9118016 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531461 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531461 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/20, C07K7/26, C07K7/06, A61K37/24, A61K37/43 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
C07K14/575 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/10 (EP);
C07D209/20 (EP);
C07K1/006 (EP);
C07K14/60 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/11] | Title | German: | D-2-ALKYLTRYPTOPHAN ENTHALTENDE BIOLOGISCH AKTIVE PEPTIDE | [1993/11] | English: | BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE PEPTIDES CONTAINING D-2-ALKYLTRYPTOPHAN | [1993/11] | French: | PEPTIDES BIOLOGIQUEMENT ACTIFS CONTENANT DU D-2-ALKYLTRYPTOPHANE | [1993/11] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/11] | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3316260 [ ] (TSUNG-YING SHEN); | EP0083864 [ ] (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]); | EP0203031 [ ] (UNIV TULANE [US]) | Examination | - NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, 29 March 1990; R.M. SILVER et al., pp. 874-881# | - CHEM. PHARM. BULLETIN, vol. 27, no. 8, 1979; Y. YABE et al., pp.1907-1911# | - ENDOCRINE REVIEWS, vol. 7, no. 1, 1986, Endocrine Society (US); M.J. KARTEN et al., pp. 44-66# | - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATL. ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, vol. 83, 1986; Y. TORRENS et al., pp. 9216-9220# |