blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0494070

EP0494070 - A hydraulic circuit for running a crawler vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.12.1999
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEIJIN SEIKI CO. Ltd.
9-1 Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [1992/28]For all designated states
TEIJIN SEIKI CO. Ltd.
9-1 Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ogawa, Kazunori
836-1, Kamitara, Kamiishizu-cho
Yoro-gun, Gifu-ken / JP
02 / Endo, Takuma
1-61-12, Azuma-cho
Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken / JP
03 / Nakashima, Hisashi
Nishijima 1010, Hirata-cho
Kaizu-gun, Gifu-ken / JP
04 / Asano, Yoji
Nakajima Aza, Minamihiraguchi 80, Konobu
Bisai-shi, Aichi-ken / JP
[1992/28]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1992/28]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
D-70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date92100006.302.01.1992
[1992/28]
Priority number, dateJP1990001000231.12.1990         Original published format: JP 1000290
[1992/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0494070
Date:08.07.1992
Language:EN
[1992/28]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0494070
Date:02.03.1994
Language:EN
[1994/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0494070
Date:29.05.1996
Language:EN
[1996/22]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0494070
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.1994
ClassificationIPC:B60K17/10, B62D11/04, E02F9/12
[1994/04]
CPC:
F16H61/4061 (EP,US); E02F9/10 (KR); B60K17/10 (EP,US);
B62D11/02 (EP,US); B62D11/183 (EP,US); E02F9/123 (EP,US);
E02F9/22 (EP,US); E02F9/2253 (EP,US); E02F9/2267 (EP,US);
E02F9/2275 (EP,US); F15B11/0445 (EP,US); F15B2211/20538 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20576 (EP,US); F15B2211/3127 (EP,US); F15B2211/327 (EP,US);
F15B2211/50527 (EP,US); F15B2211/50545 (EP,US); F15B2211/5154 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6051 (EP,US); F15B2211/6355 (EP,US); F15B2211/7058 (EP,US);
F15B2211/71 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1992/28]B60K17/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1992/28]
TitleGerman:Hydraulischer Antriebskreis für ein Raupenfahrzeug[1992/28]
English:A hydraulic circuit for running a crawler vehicle[1992/28]
French:Circuit hydraulique de propulsion d'un véhicule à chenilles[1992/28]
Examination procedure23.03.1994Examination requested  [1994/20]
18.01.1995Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.07.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1995Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.12.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.02.1996Fee for grant paid
22.02.1996Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.02.1997    ADMISSIBLE
LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zentrale Patentabteilung
D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE
 [1997/17]
08.04.1997Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
20.10.1997Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.10.1997Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
23.02.1998Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
03.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
03.08.1998Reply to a communication from the opposition division
04.05.1999Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.05.1999Date of oral proceedings
21.05.1999Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.05.1999Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.09.1999Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
10.12.1999Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.1995Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.1996Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB02.01.2000
[2001/12]
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR2193156  (KUBOTA LTD [JP]);
 [Y]FR2437512  (PPM SA)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.