EP0494611 - Rotor of rotary electric-machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.1996 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagano, Susumu Intell.Prop.Div., K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku, Toyko 105 / JP | 02 /
Mozumi, Takashi Intell.Prop.Div., K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku, Toyko 105 / JP | 03 /
Futaki, Masatoshi Intell.Prop.Div., K.K. Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku, Toyko 105 / JP | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92100074.1 | 03.01.1992 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | JP19910001545 | 10.01.1991 Original published format: JP 154591 | [1992/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0494611 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0494611 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494611 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/26, H02K3/16, H02K3/487 | [1994/16] | CPC: |
H02K1/26 (EP);
H02K3/16 (EP);
H02K3/487 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/29] | H02K1/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1992/29] | Title | German: | Anker für eine drehende elektrische Maschine | [1992/29] | English: | Rotor of rotary electric-machine | [1992/29] | French: | Rotor de machine tournante électrique | [1992/29] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/29] | 24.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JPS54142502 ; | [Y]DE1060981 (SIEMENS-SCHUCKERTWERKE AG) [Y] 1,2,5,10,11,13-15,19 * column 1, paragraph 5; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE2406861 (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 6,7 * page 1, paragraph 2; figure 1 * * page 3, line 3 - line 4; figures 2-4 *; | [A]DE1097546 (SIEMENS-SCHUCKERTWERKE) [A] 1,6,11,14 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0023073 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP.) [A] 1,6,11,14 * page 8, line 22 - line 28; figure 1 * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800108), vol. 4, no. 1, Database accession no. (E - 163)<125> , & JP54142502 A 19791106 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) [DY] 1,2,5-7,10,11,13-15,19 * abstract * |