EP0501103 - Method for manufacturing calcium-hydro-silicate bound fibre board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EURIT BAUELEMENTE GmbH Adolf-Oesterheld-Strasse D-97337 Dettelbach / DE | [1992/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sagstetter, Robert Blumenstrasse 8 W-8711 Kleinlangheim / DE | 02 /
Bauer, Adolf Am Silberbach 20 W-8719 Schwarzach/Main / DE | [1992/36] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/03] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/01] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1992/36] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92100089.9 | 04.01.1992 | [1992/36] | Priority number, date | DE19914106010 | 26.02.1991 Original published format: DE 4106010 | [1992/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0501103 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/52, D21J1/00, D21J3/00, C04B28/02, C04B28/22, C04B16/02, C04B18/08, C04B14/04 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
B28B1/525 (EP,US);
C04B28/18 (EP,US);
D21J1/00 (EP,US);
D21J3/00 (EP,US);
Y02W30/91 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/18, C04B14/062, C04B18/08, C04B18/241, C04B40/0028, C04B40/0064, C04B40/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1992/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Calciumhydrosilikat-gebundenen Faserplatten | [1992/36] | English: | Method for manufacturing calcium-hydro-silicate bound fibre board | [1992/36] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de panneaux de fibres liés par hydrosilicate de calcium | [1992/36] | Examination procedure | 16.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 22.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 03.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/14] | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/14] | Appeal following examination | 08.05.1996 | Appeal received No. T0952/96 | 04.07.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.01.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1999 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP51080326 ; | [Y]EP0381847 (FULGURIT BAUSTOFFE GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB607854 (GEORGE STANLEY MANN, et al); | [A]US4406703 (GUTHRIE BERNARD M [US], et al); | [A]DE3330124 (SIMATUPANG MARULI H DR); | [A]WO8600881 (HUNKELER LUDOVIC); | [A]EP0103195 (ARHELDER KARL HEINZ) | [Y] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX Section Ch, Week 3576, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class L, AN 76-65625X & JP-A-51 080 326 (MITSUBISHI CEMENT), & JP51080326 A 00000000 |