EP0481958 - Nozzle shield for a plasma arc torch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYPERTHERM, INC. P.O. Box 5010, Etna Road Hanover, NH 03755 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | For all designated states HYPERTHERM, INC. P.O. Box 5010, Etna Road Hanover, NH 03755 / US | ||
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states HYPERTHERM, INC. P.O. Box A-10 Etna Road Hanover, NH 03755 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanders, Nicholas A. Glen Ridge Road Norwich, Vermont 05055 / US | 02 /
Couch, Richard W., Jr. Lyme Road Hanover, New Hampshire 03755 / US | [2000/43] |
Former [1992/17] | 01 /
Sanders, Nicholas A. Glen Ridge Road Norwich, Vermont 05055 / US | ||
02 /
Couch, Richard W., Jr. Lyme Road Hanover, New Hampsire 037555 / US | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [1992/17] | Attfield, Donald James, et al BROOKES, MARTIN & WILSON Prudential Buildings 5 St. Philip's Place Birmingham B3 2AF / GB | Application number, filing date | 92100092.3 | 03.02.1989 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | US19880203440 | 07.06.1988 Original published format: US 203440 | [1992/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481958 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0481958 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H05H1/34 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
H05H1/341 (EP,US);
B23K10/006 (EP,US);
H05H1/34 (EP,US);
H05H1/3421 (EP,US);
H05H1/3442 (EP,US);
H05H1/3457 (EP,US);
H05H1/3468 (EP,US);
H05H1/3478 (EP,US);
H05H1/28 (EP,US);
H05H1/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2000/47] |
Former [1992/17] | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, SE | Title | German: | Düsenschutz für Plasmalichtbogenschweissbrenner | [1992/17] | English: | Nozzle shield for a plasma arc torch | [1992/17] | French: | Protège-buse pour une torche plasma à arc | [1992/17] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/27] | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 20.06.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 07.06.1995 | Appeal received No. T0981/95 | 03.08.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.06.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89903442.5 / EP0375747 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 03.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.07.2001 | LI | 11.07.2001 | SE | 11.10.2001 | [2015/21] |
Former [2002/05] | SE | 11.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3272962 (LEONARD MAUSKAPF); | [AD]US3641308 (COUCH RICHARD W JR, et al); | [YD]GB2091594 (EUTECTIC CORP); | [A]US4361748 (COUCH JR RICHARD W); | [Y]EP0114521 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) |